House | 03/23/2021 | File Number 104 | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | House Calendar Number 114 | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |