House | 07/13/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/25/2021 | Special Act 21-27 | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 455 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 177 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 165 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |