House | 05/27/2021 | File Number 752 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 517 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9277 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | File Number 310 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | House Calendar Number 242 | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |