Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 26, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021