House | 06/01/2021 | File Number 775 | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 534 | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9210 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | File Number 391 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 304 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |