Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2021
Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis June 1, 2021
Analysis May 28, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021