House
|
07/06/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2021
|
Public Act 21-119
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
File Number 714
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 476
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8970
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
File Number 598
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
House Calendar Number 421
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|