Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 24, 2021
Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2021