Senate | 06/09/2021 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | House Calendar Number 484 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7948 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | File Number 276 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 198 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/21/2021 | Vote to Raise |