Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 9, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill January 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 14, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021