Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Bill January 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 6, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2021