Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Public Act 21-128
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule D 10374
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10169
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10216
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 10221
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
House Calendar Number 593
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9494
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9375
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
File Number 443
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 266
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|