Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note June 5, 2021
Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Bill January 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 9, 2021
Analysis June 5, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2021