Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |