Senate | 05/26/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Special Act 21-6 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | House Calendar Number 487 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | File Number 77 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 78 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |