House
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Public Act 21-190
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10489
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House Calendar Number 559
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9355
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
File Number 279
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 188
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|