Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 8, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill January 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 12, 2021
Analysis May 27, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021