Senate | 07/07/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/28/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Public Act 21-137 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | House Calendar Number 518 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | File Number 356 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 228 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/05/2021 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |