Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00841 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 31, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021