Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00856 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 20, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 24, 2021