LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00920
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00920
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00920
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note
May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note
April 13, 2021
Bill
February 18, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
August 24, 2021
Analysis
May 21, 2021
Bill
May 11, 2021
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2021
Compare
Analysis
April 13, 2021
Chaptered
Bill
June 16, 2021
Compare