House
|
07/13/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2021
|
Public Act 21-183
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House Calendar Number 604
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10386
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
File Number 610
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 347
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|