Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 8, 2021
Fiscal Note June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 9, 2021
Analysis June 8, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021