Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House Calendar Number 564
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8662
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
File Number 662
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 393
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|