Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00948 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/10/2021

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00948-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 948  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E MODELING OF A PROP OSAL FOR 
EDUCATION FUNDING IN CONNECTICUT.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) The Office of Fiscal Analysis shall 1 
conduct an independent modeling of the education funding proposal 2 
described in senate bill 948 of the current session as favorably reported 3 
by the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 4 
cognizance of matters relating to education on March 22, 2021. 5 
(b) Such modeling shall include, but need not be limited to, (1) an 6 
analysis of the estimated fiscal impact of such proposal on (A) local and 7 
regional boards of education and operators of interdistrict magnet 8 
school programs, state and local charter schools and agricultural science 9 
and technology education centers, including the (i) receipt of grants, (ii) 10 
receipt and payment of tuition, and (iii) estimated net impact to each 11 
local and regional board of education specific to each grant described in 12 
subparagraph (B) of this subdivision, and (B) the equalization aid grant, 13 
described in section 10-262h of the general statutes, and grants for (i) 14 
interdistrict magnet school programs pursuant to section 10-264l of the 15 
general statutes, (ii) state and local charter schools pursuant to section 16 
10-66ee of the general statutes, (iii) regional agricultural science and 17 
technology centers pursuant to section 10-65 of the general statutes, and 18  Substitute Bill No. 948 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00948-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
(iv) the interdistrict public school attendance program pursuant to 19 
section 10-266aa of the general statutes, and (2) funding for the Technical 20 
Education and Career System, including such funding at a system-wide 21 
level, a school level and a per pupil level, and the effects of racial equity 22 
within the system based on such funding. 23 
(c) (1) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Office of Fiscal Analysis shall 24 
submit such modeling and a draft report to the Commissioner of 25 
Education for review and comment. 26 
(2) Not later than January 21, 2022, the commissioner, or the 27 
commissioner's designee, shall submit his or her comments and 28 
recommendations, if any, concerning such draft report to the Office of 29 
Fiscal Analysis. 30 
(d) Not later than February 1, 2022, the Office of Fiscal Analysis shall 31 
submit a report of such modeling to the joint standing committee of the 32 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education 33 
and appropriations, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a 34 
of the general statutes. Such report shall include such modeling and 35 
report, including any comments and recommendations submitted to the 36 
office by the Commissioner of Education. 37 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 1(a), "as reported out by the Education Committee" was 
replaced with "as favorably reported by the joint standing committee of 
the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to 
education", for proper form. 
 
ED  Joint Favorable C/R 	APP 
APP Joint Favorable Subst.