Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00948 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 27, 2021
Bill May 10, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021