Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Public Act 21-53
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
House Calendar Number 534
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7906
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
File Number 291
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 182
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|