Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 3, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 9, 2021