Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00952 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00952-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 5 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 952  
January Session, 2021 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING EN ERGY STORAGE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) On or before January 1, 2023, 1 
and annually thereafter, the Department of Energy and Environmental 2 
Protection and the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall report, in 3 
accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint 4 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 5 
matters relating to energy regarding the quantifiable progress of energy 6 
storage deployment against the following goals: 7 
(1) Three hundred megawatts by December 31, 2024; 8 
(2) Six hundred fifty megawatts by December 31, 2027; and 9 
(3) One thousand megawatts by December 31, 2030. 10 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) On or before January 1, 2022, 11 
the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall initiate a proceeding to 12 
develop and implement one or more programs, and associated funding 13 
mechanisms, for electric energy storage resources connected to the 14 
electric distribution system. The authority shall establish (1) one or more 15 
programs for the residential class of electric customers, (2) one or more 16 
programs for commercial and industrial classes of electric customers, 17  Substitute Bill No. 952 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00952-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 5 
 
and (3) a program for energy storage systems connected to the 18 
distribution system in front of the meter and not located at a customer 19 
premises. The authority shall solicit input from the Department of 20 
Energy and Environmental Protection, the Connecticut Green Bank, the 21 
electric distribution companies and the Office of Consumer Counsel in 22 
developing such programs. 23 
(b) On or before January 1, 2022, the authority shall report the status 24 
of the proceeding described in subsection (a) of this section, in 25 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 26 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 27 
cognizance of matters relating to energy. 28 
(c) In undertaking the proceeding described in subsection (a) of this 29 
section, the authority shall consider one or more programs and rate 30 
designs to incentivize the deployment of electric energy storage 31 
technologies connected to the electric distribution system that most 32 
effectively leverage the value of such technologies to achieve objectives 33 
including, but not limited to, (1) providing positive net present value to 34 
all ratepayers, or a subset of ratepayers paying for the benefits that 35 
accrue to that subset of ratepayers; (2) providing multiple types of 36 
benefits to the electric grid, including, but not limited to, customer, local, 37 
or community resilience, ancillary services, leveling out peaks in 38 
electricity use or that support the deployment of other distributed 39 
energy resources; (3) fostering the sustained, orderly development of a 40 
state-based electric energy storage industry; and (4) maximizing the 41 
value from the participation of energy storage systems in capacity 42 
markets. The authority shall include consideration of all energy storage 43 
configurations that are connected to the distribution system, including 44 
systems connected in front of the meter and not located at a customer 45 
premises. The authority shall also consider programs and rate designs 46 
to incentivize uses of electric energy storage technologies connected to 47 
the electric distribution system that avoid or defer investment in 48 
traditional electric distribution system capacity upgrades. 49 
(d) The authority may select the Connecticut Green Bank, the 50  Substitute Bill No. 952 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00952-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 5 
 
Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, the electric 51 
distribution companies, a third party it deems appropriate or any 52 
combination thereof, to implement one or more programs for electric 53 
energy storage resources connected to the electric distribution system, 54 
as directed by the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority. 55 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) The Commissioner of Energy 56 
and Environmental Protection, in consultation with the procurement 57 
manager identified in subsection (l) of section 16-2 of the general 58 
statutes and the Office of Consumer Counsel, may issue requests for 59 
proposals for energy storage projects connected at the transmission or 60 
distribution level, including stand-alone energy storage projects and 61 
energy storage projects paired with Class I renewable energy sources, 62 
that would achieve the goals in section 1 of this act in combination with 63 
programs established by the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority. If the 64 
Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection determines that 65 
procuring energy storage is cost effective, the commissioner shall 66 
proceed with the selection of proposals. In making this determination, 67 
the commissioner shall publish and make available for public comment 68 
a cost-effectiveness test that considers each applicable benefit provided 69 
by energy storage. 70 
(b) In making any selection of such proposals, the commissioner shall 71 
consider factors, including, but not limited to, (1) whether the proposal 72 
is in the best interest of ratepayers, including, but not limited to, the 73 
delivered price of such sources, (2) whether the proposal promotes 74 
electric distribution system reliability, including during winter peak 75 
demand, (3) any positive impacts on the state's economic development, 76 
(4) whether the proposal is consistent with the requirements to reduce 77 
greenhouse gas emissions in accordance with section 22a-200a of the 78 
general statutes, and (5) whether the proposal is consistent with the 79 
policy goals outlined in the Comprehensive Energy Strategy adopted 80 
pursuant to section 16a-3d of the general statutes and the Integrated 81 
Resources Plan adopted pursuant to section 16a-3a of the general 82 
statutes. In considering whether a proposal has any positive impacts on 83  Substitute Bill No. 952 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00952-
R01-SB.docx }   
4 of 5 
 
the state's economic development, the Commissioner of Energy and 84 
Environmental Protection shall consult with the Commissioner of 85 
Economic and Community Development. 86 
(c) Any agreement entered into pursuant to this section shall be 87 
subject to review and approval by the Public Utilities Regulatory 88 
Authority, which review shall be completed not later than one hundred 89 
twenty days after the date on which such agreement is filed with the 90 
authority. The authority shall approve any such agreement if it is cost 91 
effective and in the best interest of electric ratepayers. The net costs of 92 
any such agreement, including costs incurred by the electric distribution 93 
companies under the agreement and reasonable costs incurred by the 94 
electric distribution companies in connection with the agreement, shall 95 
be recovered through a fully reconciling component of electric rates for 96 
all customers of electric distribution companies. Any net revenues from 97 
the sale of products purchased in accordance with long-term contracts 98 
entered into pursuant to this section shall be credited to customers 99 
through the same fully reconciling rate component for all customers of 100 
the contracting electric distribution company. 101 
Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) On or before January 15, 2022, 102 
and annually thereafter, each municipal utility, as defined in section 12-103 
265 of the general statutes, shall report, in accordance with section 11-4a 104 
of the general statutes, on the quantifiable progress of its carbon 105 
reduction to the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection. 106 
Such report shall be in a manner prescribed by the department to 107 
determine such municipal utility's contribution toward the state's 108 
emission reduction requirements pursuant to section 22a-200a of the 109 
general statutes. 110 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section  Substitute Bill No. 952 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2021SB-00952-
R01-SB.docx }   
5 of 5 
 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 1(c), technical clarifying changes were made. 
 
ET Joint Favorable Subst.