Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00952 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/09/2021

                             
 
 
Substitute Senate Bill No. 952 
 
Public Act No. 21-53 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ENERGY STORAGE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) On or before January 1, 2023, 
and annually thereafter, the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection and the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall report, in 
accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 
matters relating to energy regarding the quantifiable progress of energy 
storage deployment against the following goals: 
(1) Three hundred megawatts by December 31, 2024; 
(2) Six hundred fifty megawatts by December 31, 2027; and 
(3) One thousand megawatts by December 31, 2030. 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) On or before January 1, 2022, 
the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall initiate a proceeding to 
develop and implement one or more programs, and associated funding 
mechanisms, for electric energy storage resources connected to the 
electric distribution system. The authority shall establish (1) one or more 
programs for the residential class of electric customers, (2) one or more 
programs for commercial and industrial classes of electric customers,  Substitute Senate Bill No. 952 
 
Public Act No. 21-53 	2 of 4 
 
and (3) a program for energy storage systems connected to the 
distribution system in front of the meter and not located at a customer 
premises. The authority shall solicit input from the Department of 
Energy and Environmental Protection, the Connecticut Green Bank, the 
electric distribution companies and the Office of Consumer Counsel in 
developing such programs. 
(b) On or before January 1, 2022, the authority shall report the status 
of the proceeding described in subsection (a) of this section, in 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 
cognizance of matters relating to energy. 
(c) In undertaking the proceeding described in subsection (a) of this 
section, the authority shall consider one or more programs and rate 
designs to incentivize the deployment of electric energy storage 
technologies connected to the electric distribution system that most 
effectively leverage the value of such technologies to achieve objectives 
including, but not limited to, (1) providing positive net present value to 
all ratepayers, or a subset of ratepayers paying for the benefits that 
accrue to that subset of ratepayers; (2) providing multiple types of 
benefits to the electric grid, including, but not limited to, customer, local, 
or community resilience, ancillary services, leveling out peaks in 
electricity use or that support the deployment of other distributed 
energy resources; (3) fostering the sustained, orderly development of a 
state-based electric energy storage industry; and (4) maximizing the 
value from the participation of energy storage systems in capacity 
markets. The authority shall include consideration of all energy storage 
configurations that are connected to the distribution system, including 
systems connected in front of the meter and not located at a customer 
premises. The authority shall also consider programs and rate designs 
to incentivize uses of electric energy storage technologies connected to 
the electric distribution system that avoid or defer investment in  Substitute Senate Bill No. 952 
 
Public Act No. 21-53 	3 of 4 
 
traditional electric distribution system capacity upgrades. 
(d) The authority may select the Connecticut Green Bank, the 
Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, the electric 
distribution companies, a third party it deems appropriate or any 
combination thereof, to implement one or more programs for electric 
energy storage resources connected to the electric distribution system, 
as directed by the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority. 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) The Commissioner of Energy 
and Environmental Protection, in consultation with the procurement 
manager identified in subsection (l) of section 16-2 of the general 
statutes and the Office of Consumer Counsel, may issue requests for 
proposals for energy storage projects connected at the transmission or 
distribution level, including stand-alone energy storage projects and 
energy storage projects paired with Class I renewable energy sources or 
hydropower facilities that have a nameplate capacity rating of not more 
than one hundred megawatts, that would achieve the goals in section 1 
of this act in combination with programs established by the Public 
Utilities Regulatory Authority. If the Commissioner of Energy and 
Environmental Protection determines that procuring energy storage is 
cost effective, the commissioner shall proceed with the selection of 
proposals. In making this determination, the commissioner shall 
publish and make available for public comment a cost-effectiveness test 
that considers each applicable benefit provided by energy storage. 
(b) In making any selection of such proposals, the commissioner shall 
consider factors, including, but not limited to, (1) whether the proposal 
is in the best interest of ratepayers, including, but not limited to, the 
delivered price of such sources, (2) whether the proposal promotes 
electric distribution system reliability, including during winter peak 
demand, (3) any positive impacts on the state's economic development, 
(4) whether the proposal is consistent with the requirements to reduce 
greenhouse gas emissions in accordance with section 22a-200a of the  Substitute Senate Bill No. 952 
 
Public Act No. 21-53 	4 of 4 
 
general statutes, and (5) whether the proposal is consistent with the 
policy goals outlined in the Comprehensive Energy Strategy adopted 
pursuant to section 16a-3d of the general statutes and the Integrated 
Resources Plan adopted pursuant to section 16a-3a of the general 
statutes. In considering whether a proposal has any positive impacts on 
the state's economic development, the Commissioner of Energy and 
Environmental Protection shall consult with the Commissioner of 
Economic and Community Development. 
(c) Any agreement entered into pursuant to this section shall be 
subject to review and approval by the Public Utilities Regulatory 
Authority, which review shall be completed not later than one hundred 
twenty days after the date on which such agreement is filed with the 
authority. The authority shall approve any such agreement if it is cost 
effective and in the best interest of electric ratepayers. The net costs of 
any such agreement, including costs incurred by the electric distribution 
companies under the agreement and reasonable costs incurred by the 
electric distribution companies in connection with the agreement, shall 
be recovered through a fully reconciling component of electric rates for 
all customers of electric distribution companies. Any net revenues from 
the sale of products purchased in accordance with long-term contracts 
entered into pursuant to this section shall be credited to customers 
through the same fully reconciling rate component for all customers of 
the contracting electric distribution company.