Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Public Act 21-194
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
House Calendar Number 586
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8483
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
File Number 192
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 154
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|