Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00973 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 13, 2021
Analysis June 3, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021