Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Public Act 21-32
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 9527
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 9490
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9522
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Re-offered, House Amend. Sch B 9522
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 9488
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 9530
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 9493
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 9522
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 9491
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
House Calendar Number 514
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 8787
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8776
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8747
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8722
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8710
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8737
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
File Number 613
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 349
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|