Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2021
|
Public Act 21-185
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House Calendar Number 568
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9433
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
File Number 457
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 281
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|