Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 24, 2021
Analysis May 28, 2021
Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021