Senate | 06/09/2021 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | File Number 525 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 302 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |