Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
Special Act 21-36
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
House Calendar Number 609
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10645
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 10582
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
File Number 768
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 526
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 06/01/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Public Hearing 05/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|