Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 9, 2021
Fiscal Note June 8, 2021
Fiscal Note June 1, 2021
Bill May 6, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis June 9, 2021
Bill June 1, 2021
Analysis June 1, 2021