Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 18, 2022
Analysis April 18, 2022
Analysis April 14, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis March 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2022