Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note April 4, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2022
Analysis April 14, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022
Analysis April 4, 2022