House
|
04/08/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Public Act 22-2
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 3834
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 3924
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 3813
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 3846
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 3827
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 3875
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3826
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3925
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 64
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 3556
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 3555
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3540
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
File Number 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
House Calendar Number 32
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|