Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05262 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/17/2022

                     
Researcher: TA 	Page 1 	3/17/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5262 (as amended by House "A")* 
 
AN ACT REVISING CERTAIN ABSENTEE VOTING ELIGIBILITY 
STATUTES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands two of the six statutory reasons for which qualified 
voters (i.e., electors and people eligible to vote in a referendum) may 
vote by absentee ballot in an election, primary, or referendum (see 
BACKGROUND). Under the bill, qualified voters may vote by absentee 
ballot if they are unable to appear at their polling place because of (1) 
sickness, rather than because of their own illness, or (2) physical 
disability, rather than because of their own physical disability.  
Additionally, the bill authorizes qualified voters to vote by absentee 
ballot if they are unable to appear at their polling place because of 
absence from the town of their voting residence. Current law authorizes 
voters to vote absentee for this reason only if they are absent during all 
hours of voting. 
The bill also modifies when each of the six statutory reasons for 
voting by absentee ballot applies. Currently, these reasons apply to 
qualified voters who are unable to appear at their polling place during 
the hours of voting. Under the bill, they apply to qualified voters who 
are unable to do so during the day of the election, primary, or 
referendum. 
The bill requires that absentee ballots be updated to reflect the above 
changes. Specifically, the statement printed on the face of the absentee 
ballots’ inner envelope must show the revised reasons electors may vote 
absentee. By law, absentee voters must sign the statement under 
penalties of false statement in absentee balloting, which is a class D 
felony punishable by up to five years in prison, a fine of up to $5,000, or 
both (CGS § 9-359a).  2022HB-05262-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 2 	3/17/22 
 
Lastly, the bill makes technical changes, including removing obsolete 
provisions concerning absentee voting because of the COVID-19 
sickness in the 2020 state election and any election, primary, or 
referendum from June 23, 2021, through November 2, 2021. 
*House Amendment “A” adds the provision on when each of the six 
statutory reasons for voting by absentee ballot applies. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
sSB 184 (File 6, §§ 3 & 4), reported favorably by the Government 
Administration and Elections Committee, (1) makes similar changes 
concerning absentee voting due to illness and absence from the town of 
residence and (2) allows absentee voting because of the COVID-19 
sickness for any election, primary, or referendum held through 
November 8, 2022. 
Permitted Reasons Under the Constitution for Voting by Absentee 
Ballot  
The state constitution authorizes the General Assembly to pass a law 
allowing eligible voters to cast their votes by absentee ballot if they are 
unable to appear at a polling place on election day because of (1) absence 
from their city or town, (2) sickness or physical disability, or (3) the 
tenets of their religion prohibiting secular activity (Conn. Const. Art. VI, 
§ 7). The General Assembly exercised this authority and passed laws 
codified at CGS § 9-135. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 13 Nay 6 (03/09/2022)