LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05372
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05372
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2022 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05372
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 13, 2022
Fiscal Note
May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note
May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 14, 2022
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 16, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 3, 2022
Bill
April 22, 2022
Compare
Bill
April 14, 2022
Compare
Analysis
April 14, 2022