House | 04/14/2022 | File Number 496 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | House Calendar Number 351 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |