Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2022
Analysis April 14, 2022