House | 04/30/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 534 | ||
House | 04/30/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule C 5837 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 5805 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5828 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | File Number 506 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | House Calendar Number 361 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |