House | 05/03/2022 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Adopted, Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 542 | ||
House | 04/30/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | File Number 556 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | House Calendar Number 406 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |