House | 05/03/2022 | House Calendar Number 550 | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6054 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | File Number 211 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 167 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |