Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00099 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 3, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022
Analysis March 30, 2022