Senate | 04/21/2022 | House Calendar Number 420 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5079 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | File Number 66 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 80 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |